This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/30/2019 at 13:40:51 (UTC).

GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL vs LENNAR HOMES, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LENNAR HOMES, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Holder, P. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0731

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Holder, P. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARDNER, MELISSA

Tampa, FL 33602

GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

LENNAR HOMES, LLC

1200 S. Pine Island Rd., Ste. 250

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE , DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at BURNETT LAW, P.A.

200 N Pierce St

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

BURT , STEPHANIE NICOLE

Attorney at MS. STEPHANIE NICOLE BURT

100 N Tampa St Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

03/25/2019: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/26/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

OBJECTION

02/15/2019: OBJECTION

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/13/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/31/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/21/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/21/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/21/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/21/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/21/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL; Private Attorney: GREENE , DAVID MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: LENNAR HOMES, LLC; Private Attorney: BURT , STEPHANIE NICOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: LENNAR HOMES, LLC; Private Attorney: BURT , STEPHANIE NICOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: LENNAR HOMES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: LENNAR HOMES, LLC CT CORPORATION SYSTEM-1/24/19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL; Private Attorney: GREENE , DAVID MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 1 dgreene@burnettlaw.com ; nschoen@burnettlaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: LENNAR HOMES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARDNER, MELISSA; Plaintiff: GARDNER, ROBERT MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2019130322; Judge: Holder, Gregory P

    Read MoreRead Less