This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 10/24/2019 at 19:58:02 (UTC).

Garcia, Ricardo vs Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Garcia, Ricardo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Consumer Auto Credit, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rice, G. Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2518

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rice, G. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Ricardo

Defendant

Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REBEIN , PAUL WILLIAM

Defendant Attorneys

XENAKIS , SEAN-KELLY

BRUMBY , WILLIAM BUICE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

COMPLAINT

03/11/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/04/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/16/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/23/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Comment: 1X- NO SUBP ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: CASES MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: (1ST) TO PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 1 Service-Rebein@rbr3.com ; paul@rbr3.com ; jennifer@rbr3.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garcia, Ricardo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less