Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 10:39:03 (UTC).

Gambrell, Carol vs Amscot Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 Gambrell, Carol filed an Other lawsuit against Amscot Corporation. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Isom, R. Claudia, Peacock, A. Emily and Manning, M. Daryl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6610

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Isom, R. Claudia

Peacock, A. Emily

Manning, M. Daryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gambrell, Carol

Tampa, FL 33677

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BDG Architects, PLLC

Tampa, FL 33602

FPSC ENTERPRISES LLC

AMSCOT CORPORATION

600 N. Westshore Blvd, 12Th Floor C/O Ian Mackechnie, Reg. Agent

Tampa, FL 33609

Trimar Construction, Inc.

1720 West Cass Street C/O William J. Wagner, Registered Agent

Tampa, FL 33606

Spiros Pizza Houses, Inc.

3018 Joan Court C/O William Fotopoulos, Registered Agent

Land O Lakes, FL 34639

FLORIDA PLAYGROUND & STEEL, CO

Cross Defendant

TRIMAR CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSELLO , ROLAND A, Esquire

Attorney at ROLAND A. ROSELLO, P.L.

Po Box 4315

Tampa, FL 33677

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MCELFATRICK , BRIAN T, Esquire

Attorney at BUSH ROSS P.A.

P O Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601-3913

VOECKS , DORICE ROSE

Attorney at COLE SCOTT & KISSANE

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

KAYAN , BORA SABIH

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE SARASOTA COUNTY ATTORNEY

1660 Ringling Blvd Fl 2

Sarasota, FL 34236-6808

SOTO , NICOLE FARINAS

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

VALENTINE , STEPHANIE MARIE

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF PETER J. DELAHUNTY

600 N West Shore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

02/15/2019: CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

OBJECTION

01/25/2019: OBJECTION

DEPOSITION OF

11/01/2018: DEPOSITION OF

MOTION TO - FOR

06/28/2017: MOTION TO - FOR

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/05/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/10/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/16/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/15/2016: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/15/2016: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED

02/26/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

02/22/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/01/2018: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/26/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

09/07/2017: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/24/2017: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/21/2017: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

07/20/2017: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/01/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: BDG Architects, PLLC; Private Attorney: MCELFATRICK , BRIAN T, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Comment: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gambrell, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED; Comment: HILLSBROUGH COUNTY; Additional Info: Defendant: Amscot Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED; Comment: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY; Additional Info: Defendant: Amscot Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DORICE R VOECKS; Additional Info: Defendant: FLORIDA PLAYGROUND & STEEL, CO; Defendant: FPSC ENTERPRISES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
299 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DISCLOSURE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION - BORA S KAYAN, ESQ.; Additional Info: Defendant: Amscot Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - roland@rolandarosello.com ; debbie@rolandarosello.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Amscot Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019011492; Judge: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMSCOT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOTO , NICOLE FARINAS