This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/15/2020 at 15:54:19 (UTC).

Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC vs Edison Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Edison Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Huey, L. Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5590

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Huey, L. Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

C/O Weber, Crabb, Wein 5453 Central Ave.

St. Petersburg, FL 33710

Defendant

Edison Insurance Company

C/O Fl Cfo P. O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAILIE , JEREMY DAVID

Attorney at WEBER, CRABB & WEIN, P.A.

5453 Central Ave

Saint Petersburg, FL 33710

Defendant Attorney

WOOD , SAMANTHA R

Attorney at QUINTAIROS, PRIETO, WOOD & BOYER, P.A.

4190 Belfort Rd Ste 450

Jacksonville, FL 32216

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/10/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: Edison Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT 08/28/20 PLH; Additional Info: Defendant: Edison Insurance Company; Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC; Private Attorney: BAILIE , JEREMY DAVID; Private Attorney: WOOD , SAMANTHA R; Date 2: 08/28/2020; Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Edison Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVED ON EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY - 8/7/2020; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - jeremy.bailie@webercrabb.com ; lisa.willis@webercrabb.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Edison Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less