This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/13/2020 at 19:12:56 (UTC).

Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC vs Capitol Preferred Insurance Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Capitol Preferred Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0553

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

C/O Weber, Crabb, Wein - 5453 Central Ave

St. Petersburg, FL 33710

Defendant

Capitol Preferred Insurance Company, Inc.

C/O Fl Cfo P. O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAILIE , JEREMY DAVID

Attorney at WEBER, CRABB & WEIN, P.A.

5453 Central Ave

Saint Petersburg, FL 33710

Defendant Attorney

MATERA , JOSEPH A

Attorney at GROELLE & SALMON, P.A.

1715 N West Shore Blvd Ste 320

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Capitol Preferred Insurance Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 8/11/2020 - DEFT: CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Capitol Preferred Insurance Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Capitol Preferred Insurance Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gale Force Roofing and Restoration, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less