Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/16/2019 at 10:01:04 (UTC).

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC vs NIEVES, DENISE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NIEVES, DENISE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6689

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

5801 Ulmerton Road Ste 201

Cleawater, FL 33760

Defendant

NIEVES, DENISE

Tampa, FL 33634

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORR , DAVID DYLAN

Attorney at RSIEH LLP

5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/09/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

05/30/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/28/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

03/27/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/04/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/28/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/28/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

01/28/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/28/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/28/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • FACT INFORMATION SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: NIEVES, DENISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: NIEVES, DENISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Signature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: NIEVES, DENISE; Date Served: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: NIEVES, DENISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Judgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019304899; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORR DAVID