This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/25/2023 at 05:50:56 (UTC).

Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc vs Lagos, Damien L

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lagos, Damien L. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, A. Matthew, Smith, Matthew. A and Smith, Matthew A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6508

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, A. Matthew

Smith, Matthew. A

Smith, Matthew A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

Defendant

Lagos, Damien L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

01/26/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/31/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/10/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

03/10/2023: COURT TICKET

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

03/20/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/20/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

FACT INFORMATION SHEET

03/20/2023: FACT INFORMATION SHEET

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

03/20/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

NOTICE

05/19/2023: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Judge: Smith, Matthew A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFACT INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT AND CHAIN OF TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 12 - IN PERSON 401 N JEFFERSON ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Smith, Matthew A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRE-TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Lagos, Damien L;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DAMIEN L LAGOS, 1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Lagos, Damien L;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less