This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/23/2021 at 06:20:40 (UTC).

Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc vs Bermudez, Jason

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bermudez, Jason. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle, Ober, Joelle. Ann, Weis, A. Richard and Weis, Richard. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3977

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

Bermudez, Jason

Seffner, FL 33584

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CURTIS , WILHELMINA BLOSSOM

Attorney at WILHELMINA B. CURTIS, P.A.

Po Box 756

Riverview, FL 33568

Defendant Attorney

DRAKE , JONATHAN GLEN

Attorney at DRAKE LAW, P.A.

4830 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 600

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/18/2021: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/08/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/08/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/02/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/02/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO ANSWER FILED ON 7/28/2021; Additional Info: Defendant: Bermudez, Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Bermudez, Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Bermudez, Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Bermudez, Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Bermudez, Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Comment: ( EAST ); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Galaxy International Purchasing, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURTIS , WILHELMINA BLOSSOM