Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/15/2021 at 17:23:57 (UTC).

Forward Financing LLC vs R & M Quality Work, Corp.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Forward Financing LLC filed an Other lawsuit against R M Quality Work, Corp. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2809

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Forward Financing LLC

53 State Street, 20Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Defendants

R & M Quality Work, Corp.

6811 Tuttle Street Royslan Morejon

Tampa, FL 33634

Morejon, Royslan

Tampa, FL 33634

R & M QUALITY WORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDELSON , MARK

Attorney at SILVERMAN THOMPSON SLUTKIN & WHITE, LLC

201 N Charles St Fl 26

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/16/2021: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/09/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/09/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/09/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/08/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 3/15/2021 DEFT ROYSLAN MOREJON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Forward Financing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Forward Financing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: R & M Quality Work, Corp.; Defendant Doing Business As: R & M QUALITY WORK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Morejon, Royslan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Forward Financing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Forward Financing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Forward Financing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORWARD FINANCING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDELSON, MARK