This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/28/2021 at 16:03:59 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC vs SMITH, ROBERT W

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH, ROBERT W. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, S. James, Moody, James. S and Moody, James S, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9508

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

Moody, James S, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

C/O Michael Ingino, Esq. 1333 South University Drive, Suite 201

Plantation, FL 33324

LINCOLN AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

CHENG, YIN

Tampa, FL 33647-3368

SMITH, ROBERT W

Tampa, FL 33647-3368

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INGINO , MICHAEL JAMES

Attorney at MOODY, JONES & INGINO, P.A.

1333 S University Dr Ste 201

Plantation, FL 33324-4001

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/28/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/28/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/28/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

09/30/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

09/30/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 510 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Moody, James S, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Instrument Number: 2021542481; Judge: Moody, James S, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: CHENG, YIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: SMITH, ROBERT W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINCOLN AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ingino, Michael James