Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/03/2021 at 14:18:23 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC vs MORALES, BERNARDO W

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORALES, BERNARDO W. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle, Ober, Joelle. Ann and Ober, Joelle Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6549

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

Ober, Joelle Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

C/O Michael J Ingino Esq. 1333 S University Drive Suite 201

Plantation, FL 33324

LINCOLN AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

MORALES, BERNARDO W

Temple Terrace, FL 33617-7127

SWARTS, DEBBIE E

Temple Terrace, FL 33617-7127

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INGINO , MICHAEL JAMES

Attorney at MOODY, JONES & INGINO, P.A.

1333 S University Dr Ste 201

Plantation, FL 33324-4001

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/07/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/06/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/20/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/20/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 301 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 4/30/2021 DEFT DEBBIE E SWARTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: BERNANDO W MORALES AKA BERNARDO WILLIAM MORALES 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: SWARTS, DEBBIE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: MORALES, BERNARDO W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINCOLN AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ingino, Michael James