This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/16/2022 at 02:41:44 (UTC).

FONSECA, HERMAN vs LOWE'S C/O REG AGNT CORPORATION SEVICE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 FONSECA, HERMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOWE'S C/O REG AGNT CORPORATION SEVICE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3047

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FONSECA, HERMAN

Tampa, FL 33629

Defendant

LOWE'S C/O REG AGNT CORPORATION SEVICE COMPANY

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

 

Court Documents

PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/21/2022: PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED

07/05/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: SET IN ERROR; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SERVED R/A CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY; Additional Info: Defendant: LOWE'S C/O REG AGNT CORPORATION SEVICE COMPANY; Date Served: 06/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FONSECA, HERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FONSECA, HERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FONSECA, HERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lowe's Companies, Inc. is a litigant