This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/20/2022 at 14:22:28 (UTC).

FMG Florida Mobile Glass, LLC vs Equity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 FMG Florida Mobile Glass, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Equity Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3742

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FMG Florida Mobile Glass, LLC

5331 Primrose Lake Circle, Suite 228

Tampa, FL 33467

Ramos, John

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant

Equity Insurance Company

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent Service Of Process Section 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLINE , JAMES WAYNE

7788 Sugar Bend Dr

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant Attorney

GOLDSTEIN , FRANK STEVEN

Attorney at GOLDSTEIN LAW GROUP

7901 Sw 6Th Ct Ste 250

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/19/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/19/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/22/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/22/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

12/22/2021: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/22/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/22/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

12/30/2021: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/30/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/30/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

12/30/2021: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/04/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION TO VACATE

01/13/2022: MOTION TO VACATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF COURTNEY GAYLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT, ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Equity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Equity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO VACATE; Comment: CLERK'S DEFAULT; Additional Info: Defendant: Equity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Equity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO NO CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE; Additional Info: Defendant: Equity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO NO CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Equity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Equity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FMG Florida Mobile Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FMG Florida Mobile Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FMG Florida Mobile Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FMG Florida Mobile Glass, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fmg Florida Mobile Glass. Llc. A/A/O Crown Equipment Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Equity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLINE , JAMES WAYNE