Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/11/2021 at 00:27:27 (UTC).

FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,,RHOADS, DOROTHY vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 FLORIDA WELLNESS REHAB, P A ,,RHOADS, DOROTHY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6527

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Wellness & Rehab, P.A., D/B/A Florida Wellness Medicial Group A/A/O Dorothy Rhoads

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

RHOADS, DOROTHY

FLORIDA WELLNESS MEDICIAL GROUP

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

KAMPF , DAVID B

Attorney at RAMEY & KAMPF, P.A.

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,; Plaintiff: RHOADS, DOROTHY; Plaintiff Doing Business As: FLORIDA WELLNESS MEDICIAL GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA WELLNESS & REHAB, P.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA WELLNESS MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Wellness & Rehab PA is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER