This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/16/2023 at 00:48:37 (UTC).

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC,Johnson, Alma vs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC,Johnson, Alma filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6220

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

Johnson, Alma

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

BRINGUIER , MICHAEL ERNESTO

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/23/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/23/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/26/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/26/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/13/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/13/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/14/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/14/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/16/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/05/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/12/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023190874; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC; Private Attorney: GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less