This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/07/2022 at 01:12:43 (UTC).

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS LLC,Carlson, Wade vs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS LLC,Carlson, Wade filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7414

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Carlson, Wade

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

MUNIZ , HECTOR DANILLO, Jr

Attorney at ANDREWS BIERNACKI DAVIS

5802 Breckenridge Pkwy Ste 103

Tampa, FL 33610

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/24/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: MUNIZ , HECTOR DANILLO, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: MUNIZ , HECTOR DANILLO, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant