This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/07/2022 at 00:36:30 (UTC).

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC,Alvarez, Marco vs INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC,Alvarez, Marco filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7355

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Alvarez, Marco

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

GONZALEZ, CYNTHIA M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA & ASSO

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 850

Tampa, FL 33602-5155

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/24/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/24/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/24/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/24/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant