This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/10/2022 at 10:15:21 (UTC).

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC,Hathaway, Cindy vs INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC,Hathaway, Cindy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4706

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Hathaway, Cindy

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Cfo As Ra 200 East Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDAU , TODD ANDREW

Attorney at TODD LANDAU, P.A.

4601 Sheridan St Ste 200

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorney

MOLLAGHAN , JOHN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA & ASSO

3060 E College Ave # 105

Ruskin, FL 33570

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/21/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/23/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/23/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/22/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOLLAGHAN, JOHN