This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/10/2023 at 02:10:21 (UTC).

Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc,BROWNE, WILLIAM vs Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc,BROWNE, WILLIAM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3020

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWNE, WILLIAM

Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH , DANIEL B

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

BASTARDO , OSCAR JESUS

Attorney at ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

4443 Lyons Rd Ste 206

Coconut Creek, FL 33073

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/12/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/12/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

01/12/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/18/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/23/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/13/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER

02/13/2023: ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Surgery Consultants, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less