This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/02/2021 at 01:19:13 (UTC).

Florida Physical Medicine, LLC vs GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 Florida Physical Medicine, LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3360

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

1380 N. University Drive, Suite 200

Plantation, FL 33322

Rodocker, Scarlett

Defendants

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

9800 Fredericksburg Road

San Antonio, TX 78288

GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

ARPEN , CATHERINE VANN

Attorney at DUTTON LAW GROUP

4921 Memorial Hwy Ste 110

Tampa, FL 33634

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/11/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/11/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

10/14/2021: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/14/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2021586531; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. 10/25/2021; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS. ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Physical Medicine, Llc. A/A/O Roger Love is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARPEN , CATHERINE VANN