This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/22/2021 at 02:32:40 (UTC).

Florida Physical Medicine, LLC,Borowska, Elzbieta vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Florida Physical Medicine, LLC,Borowska, Elzbieta filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5888

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

1380 North University Drive Suite #200

Plantation, FL 33322

Borowska, Elzbieta

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

P.O. Box 106140

Atlanta, GA 30348

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

KAMPF , DAVID B

Attorney at RAMEY & KAMPF, P.A.

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/15/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/17/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/17/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/14/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/14/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/14/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: 09/28/2021 DEFT. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ATTACHED PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Physical Medicine, Llc. A/A/O Roger Love is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant