This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 21:03:16 (UTC).

Florida Physical Medicine, LLC,CLARKE, PATRICE vs Geico Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Florida Physical Medicine, LLC,CLARKE, PATRICE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2647

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Physical Medicine, Llc. A/A/O Patrice Clarke

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

CLARKE, PATRICE

Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CURA , LORIE SCHAEFER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

111 2Nd Ave Ne Ste 1600

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant Attorney

PALUMBO , NORMAN ANTHONY SANTO, III

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

05/05/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/21/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/21/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/17/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

03/17/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER

02/21/2022: ANSWER

ANSWER

02/21/2022: ANSWER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/18/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

01/14/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Physical Medicine, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Physical Medicine, Llc. A/A/O Roger Love is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURA , LORIE SCHAEFER