This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/05/2022 at 23:42:46 (UTC).

Florida Mobile Glass vs Wesco Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Florida Mobile Glass filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Wesco Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8505

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Mobile Glass A/A/O Sol Y Vida Adult Day Care Inc

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Florida Mobile Glass

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

SOL Y VIDA ADULT DAY CARE INC

Defendant

Wesco Insurance Company

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

WADSWORTH , CHRISTOPHER WAYNE

Attorney at WADSWORTH MARGREY & DIXON LLP

261 Ne 1St St Fl 5

Miami, FL 33132

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/02/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/03/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/03/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/06/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

05/31/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/09/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/09/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/20/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

06/22/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO FILE_A RESP_0NSE TO DEFEN1)ANT'S_ANSWE.R AND AFFIRMAIIVE DEEENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass; Plaintiff: SOL Y VIDA ADULT DAY CARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Wesco Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Mobile Glass is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William