This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/22/2022 at 08:45:01 (UTC).

Florida Mobile Glass vs State Farm Fire And Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Florida Mobile Glass filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5530

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Mobile Glass A/A/O Neysha Oquendo

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Florida Mobile Glass

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

OQUENDO, NEYSHA

Defendant

State Farm Fire And Casualty Company

Florida Department Of Financial Services .Process Section Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

EVANS , ALINA KATHERINE

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/27/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Mobile Glass is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William