This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 14:19:47 (UTC).

Florida Mobile Glass vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/15/2022 Florida Mobile Glass filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, Michael. J and Hooi, J. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2784

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, Michael. J

Hooi, J. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Mobile Glass A/A/O Eric Blackman

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

BLACKMAN, ERIC

Florida Mobile Glass

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/14/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/14/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/14/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

02/16/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO COM-PLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED THEREWITH; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Mobile Glass is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William