This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/29/2022 at 12:15:10 (UTC).

Florida Mobile Glass vs Great Lakes Insurance Se

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Florida Mobile Glass filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Great Lakes Insurance Se. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8504

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Mobile Glass A/A/O Blue Jay Trucking Inc 2

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

BLUE JAY TRUCKING INC 2

Florida Mobile Glass

7320 Griffin Rd Ste 203

Davie, FL 33314

Defendant

Great Lakes Insurance Se

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON , KEVIN WILLIAM

Attorney at KEVIN W RICHARDSON, PLLC

5402 W Laurel St Ste 203

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

LEVIN , DAVID BRIAN

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON

100 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 1620

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/02/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/02/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/03/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/03/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/06/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/27/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/30/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/14/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/23/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Additional Info: Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Se; Date 2: 05/30/2022; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: INVOICE AND PROOF OF SUBMISSION - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AS COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES , ATTY DAVID B LEVIN; Additional Info: Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Great Lakes Insurance Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Mobile Glass

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Mobile Glass is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Lakes Insurance SE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richardson, Kevin William