This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/06/2022 at 15:31:25 (UTC).

State of Florida Department of Transportation vs Tru-Trans Serviceset al,

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 State of Florida Department of Transportation filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Tru-Trans Services,. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5240

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Florida Department of Transportation

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendants

Hillsborough County Tax Collector

Tampa, FL 33619

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES THAT MAY HAVE AN INTEREST IN PARCEL 103

Bolton, Virgil Keith

Plant City, FL 33566

Tru-Trans Services

5945 Florida Avenue

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ , ALOYMA M

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

11201 Mckinley Dr

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant Attorneys

FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

SIMON , BRENT EVAN

Attorney at BRENT SIMON LAW GROUP

5945 Florida Ave

New Port Richey, FL 34652-2330

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/25/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

06/25/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/27/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/25/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STIPULATION

04/12/2022: STIPULATION

STIPULATION

04/07/2022: STIPULATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/10/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE

02/09/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE

02/08/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/04/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE

02/03/2022: NOTICE

ORDER

01/25/2022: ORDER

STIPULATED ORDER

01/18/2022: STIPULATED ORDER

JOINT STIPULATION

01/14/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

DECLARATION OF TAKING

01/05/2022: DECLARATION OF TAKING

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

11/30/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJZ; Judgment Description: AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2022203158; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: SFJ; Judgment Description: STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2022193898; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING - 03/30/2022 @900AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF EXCHANGE; Additional Info: Defendant: Tru-Trans Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ALOYMA M. SANCHEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less