This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/18/2021 at 09:27:16 (UTC).

Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/05/2021 Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3474

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc A/A/O Lisa Reid

P.O. Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802-4449

Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

P.O. Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802-4449

Reid, Lisa

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASTEN , DONALD JAMES

Attorney at DONALD J. MASTEN, LLC

Po Box 4449

Orlando, FL 32802

Defendant Attorney

SHARP , MATTHEW DAVID

Attorney at MR. MATTHEW D. SHARP

4301 West Boy Scout Boulevard, Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/09/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/05/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/05/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Auto Glass Service, Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTEN , DONALD JAMES