This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/20/2021 at 09:32:46 (UTC).

FLOM, BEVERLY B. - Estate

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 FLOM, BEVERLY B - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, Vivian. T and Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3020

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, Vivian. T

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioners and Trustees

FLOM, MARK ROBERT

Atlanta, GA 30342

THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

C/O Vanessa De Los Reyes 600 Brickell Avenue Suite 2400

Miami, FL 33131

BEVERLY BOYETT FLOM REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED

C/O Vanessa De Los Reyes 600 Brickell Avenue Suite 2400

Miami, FL 33131

FLOM, CHANDLER R

Tampa, FL 33611

FLOM, TAYLOR K

Tampa, FL 33603

Flom, Chandler R.

Satellite Beach, FL 32937

Flom, Taylor K.

Satellite Beach, FL 32937

Decedent

FLOM, BEVERLY B.

Tampa, FL 33629

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Trustee Attorneys

RICHARDS , GREGORY ALLAN, Jr

Attorney at ALLEN DELL, P.A

202 S Rome Ave Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33606

KOUFFMAN , DOMINIC

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602

SILVA , JESSICA LYNN

Attorney at LAW FIRM OF JESSICA LYNN SILVA, PLLC

1360 South Patrick Dr Ste 4

Satellite Beach, FL 32937

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: FIRST PUB: 09/17/21; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FED ESTATE TAX RETU DUE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL-APPT PR; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Date 2: 09/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT; Additional Info: Decedent: FLOM, BEVERLY B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Flom, Taylor K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: MARK ROBERT FLOM; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: MARK ROBERT FLOM, CO-TRUSTEE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY, CO-TRUSTEE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Petitioner: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY; Trustee: THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 08/31/21; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: RICHARDS , GREGORY ALLAN, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST; Additional Info: Beneficiary: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Personal Representative: FLOM, MARK ROBERT; Petitioner: FLOM, MARK ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Northern Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOUFFMAN , DOMINIC