This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/17/2022 at 06:55:18 (UTC).

Fleet Auto Glass, Inc. vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Fleet Auto Glass, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4226

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fleet Auto Glass, Inc. A/A/O Charles Halstead

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

HALSTEAD, CHARLES

Defendants

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurancecompany

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRIETO , ANTHONY THOMAS

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

JOZWIAK , ERICA LOREN

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/23/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/23/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/23/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/23/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/24/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/24/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/10/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/14/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

06/15/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

06/15/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/15/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS /s/ Anthony T. Prieto; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fleet Auto Glass, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fleet Auto Glass, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOZWIAK , ERICA LOREN