This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/17/2020 at 06:35:12 (UTC).

Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle vs Flandreau, Robert

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Flandreau, Robert. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lefler, Lawrence. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2305

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lefler, Lawrence

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

Tampa, FL 33647

Respondent

Flandreau, Robert

Tampa, FL 33647

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRZEPIS , BRUCE EDWARD

Attorney at AYO & IKEN, PLC

4807 U.S. Highway 19, Suite 202

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Respondent Attorney

BRENNAN , KEVIN DOUGLAS

Attorney at MEROS, SMITH, LAZZARA, BRENNAN & BRENNAN

Po Box 27

St Petersburg, FL 33731

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketINITIAL JURISDICTION ORDER; Additional Info: Date 2: 05/14/2020; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle; Respondent: Flandreau, Robert; Signed: 05/13/2020; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM; Comment: WITH UNSIGNED ORDER ATTACHED; Additional Info: Private Attorney: PRZEPIS , BRUCE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketORDER (FAMILY); Comment: REQUIRING REMOTE APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Date Signed: 05/12/2020; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Respondent: Flandreau, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 410 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTCHD AFFIDAVIT OF INITIAL JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketORDER TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT FAMILY; Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/29/2020; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle; Respondent: Flandreau, Robert; Signed: 04/29/2020; Judicial Officer: Lefler, Lawrence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTCHD MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Respondent: Flandreau, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: BRUCE E. PRZEPIS, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF THE PETITIONER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Flandreau-Ehlinger, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRZEPIS, BRUCE EDWARD