This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/18/2023 at 03:09:12 (UTC).

FLAGSTAR BANK N.A. vs POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 FLAGSTAR BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2210

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.

Defendants

PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.

POLK, SUSAN LYNCH

POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr

THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEIDEN , JEFFREY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

WAYNE , ROBERT

APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

05/05/2023: ANSWER

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

04/28/2023: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/27/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/18/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/15/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/07/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/07/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/29/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/29/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

03/13/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Comment: 04/26/23 RF; Additional Info: Defendant: PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: POLK, SUSAN LYNCH; Defendant: POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr; Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.; Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.; Private Attorney: APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL; Private Attorney: SEIDEN , JEFFREY MICHAEL; Private Attorney: WAYNE , ROBERT; Date Signed: 04/26/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr; Date 2: 04/27/2023; Judicial Officer:: Gabbard, Jennifer X;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: POLK, SUSAN LYNCH; Defendant: POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr; Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.; Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8; Additional Info: Defendant: PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: POLK, SUSAN LYNCH; Defendant: POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr; Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less