This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/17/2023 at 00:03:28 (UTC).

FLAGSTAR BANK N.A. vs POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 FLAGSTAR BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, X. Jennifer and Gabbard, Jennifer. X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2210

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.

Defendants

PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.

POLK, SUSAN LYNCH

POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr

THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEIDEN , JEFFREY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

REISS , MICHELLE TSERING

WAYNE , ROBERT

APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

08/30/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/29/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

08/25/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ORDER DENYING MOTION

08/25/2023: ORDER DENYING MOTION

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

06/27/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION

06/23/2023: NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

06/22/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

06/15/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/15/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 02:15 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Comment: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS WILLIAM POLK AND SUSAN POLK'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 08/29/23 AT 2:15 PM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS WILLIAM POLK AND SUSAN POLK'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DENIED JUDGE J.X.G. 08/25/2023; Additional Info: Defendant: PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: POLK, SUSAN LYNCH; Defendant: POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr; Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.; Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.; Private Attorney: APPLETON , ERIC NEWELL; Private Attorney: REISS , MICHELLE TSERING; Private Attorney: SEIDEN , JEFFREY MICHAEL; Private Attorney: WAYNE , ROBERT; Date 2: 08/25/2023; Judicial Officer:: Gabbard, Jennifer X;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLAGSTAR BANK N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8; Additional Info: Defendant: PARKWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: POLK, SUSAN LYNCH; Defendant: POLK, WILLIAM FRANKLIN, Jr; Defendant: THE WESTWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF WALDEN LAKE, INC.; Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2; Defendant: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less