Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/17/2020 at 10:18:43 (UTC).

Fitzpatrick, Veronica Ellen - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 Fitzpatrick, Veronica Ellen - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0823

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

Sooy, Patricia

New Port Richey, FL 34655

Sulsky, Mary

Brooklyn, NY 11235

Feroldi, Kerry

Stafford, VA 22554

Rehm, Anne

Brick, NJ 08724

Fitzpatrick, James

Hazlet, NJ 07730

Berardo, Joan

Runson, NJ 07760

Peavy, Jane

Phgoenicia, NY 12464

Shown, Eileen

Morganville, NJ 07751

Fitzpatrick, John

Brooklyn, NJ 11214

Fitzpatrick, Christian

Pebble Beach, CA 93953

QUIRKE, MARIA D

FITZPATRICK, JOHN R

Claimants

BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC

2995 Drew St, 2Nd Fl, Auto/Legal Dept

Clearwater, FL 33759

ST JOSEPHS HOSPITAL

C/O Baycare Health System (Auto/Legal Dept) 2995 Drew St, East Bldg, 2Nd Fl

Clearwater, FL 33759

TAMPA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

C/O Probate Recovery Systems Llc P O Box 40

Largo, FL 33779

AMERICARE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC

11301 Us Hwy 92 E

Seffner, FL 33584

RUFFOLO, HOOPER & ASSOCIATES, M.D. P.A

5755 Hoover Blvd

Tampa, FL 33634-5340

ADVENTHEALTH MED GROUP OF WEST FLORIDA

Po Box 182221

Chattanooga, TN 37422

TRUIST BANK.

C/O Simm Associates, Inc 800 Pencader Drive

Newark, DE 19702

Decedent

Fitzpatrick, Veronica Ellen

Tampa, FL 33624

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

HOOK , DAVID ANTHONY

Attorney at THE HOOK LAW GROUP

4918 Floramar Ter

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketORDER AUTH SALE OF PROPERTY; Comment: AMENDED; Additional Info: Decedent: Fitzpatrick, Veronica Ellen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ORD AUTH SALE OF PROP; Comment: THIRD AMENDED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $256.17, COURTSERVICE@ELDERLAWCENTER.COM 06/16/2020; Additional Info: Claimant: TRUIST BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $565.86, COURTSERVICE@ELDERLAWCENTER.COM 06/16/2020; Additional Info: Claimant: TRUIST BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: SIMM ASSOCIATES 06/10/20; Additional Info: Claimant: TRUIST BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: SIMM ASSOCIATES 06/10/20; Additional Info: Claimant: TRUIST BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA ACH - eCERTIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $1816.00, COURTSERVICE@ELDERLAWCENTER.COM 05/29/2020; Additional Info: Claimant: ADVENTHEALTH MED GROUP OF WEST FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: JOHN FITZPATRICK; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: KERRY FEROLDI; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: MARY SULSKY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: E-FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: ST OF NY GUARDIANSHIP DOCUMENT RE JOHN FITZPATRICK; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND OR ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Sooy, Patricia; Personal Representative: Sooy, Patricia; Petitioner: Sooy, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUFFOLO, HOOPER & ASSOCIATES, M.D. P.A is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTHEALTH MED GROUP WEST FL is a litigant

Latest cases where TAMPA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICARE AMBULANCE SERVICE, INC. is a litigant