This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/23/2021 at 20:13:26 (UTC).

Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc. vs Browning, Stefanie

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Browning, Stefanie. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4271

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

5550 W. Executive Drive Suite 250

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

Browning, Stefanie

Lithia, FL 33547

Unknown Tenant 2

Lithia, FL 33547

Unknown Tenant 1

Lithia, FL 33547

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSS , BRENTON JOSEPH

Attorney at FRISCIA & ROSS P A

5550 W Executive Dr Ste 250

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/13/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/30/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY THE COURT AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: STEFANIE BROWNING. 12/21/2020; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT 1.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT 2.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Browning, Stefanie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Tenant 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Tenant 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Browning, Stefanie; Defendant: Unknown Tenant 1; Defendant: Unknown Tenant 2; Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fishhawk Ridge Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less