This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 02:04:11 (UTC).

Fieldturf USA, Inc. vs 1st Turf, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 Fieldturf USA, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1st Turf, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0664

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fieldturf USA, Inc.

175 N Industrial Blvd., Ne

Calhoun, GA 30701

Defendant

1st Turf, Inc.

2906 Bay To Bay Blvd Suite B

Tampa, FL 33629

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LILLY , SCOTT RANDALL

Attorney at GIONIS, LILLY & ROMERO, PLLC

Po Box 172667

Tampa, FL 33672

Defendant Attorney

WHITE , ROBERT FREDERICK

Attorney at MR. ROBERT FREDERICK WHITE

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/25/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/25/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/25/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/25/2022: COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

01/25/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ATTACHMENT

01/25/2022: ATTACHMENT

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

03/07/2022: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: 1st Turf, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; Comment: OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fieldturf USA, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fieldturf USA, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fieldturf USA, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fieldturf USA, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fieldturf USA, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Fieldturf USA, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: 1st Turf, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIELDTURF USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LILLY , SCOTT RANDALL