This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/31/2020 at 23:20:22 (UTC).

FIDELITY BANK vs JULES, EDELENE

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 FIDELITY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULES, EDELENE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3154

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY BANK

4100-3 Southpoint Drive E

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

JULES, EDELENE

Seffner, FL 33584-3313

LUBERISSE, LEECHING-HONG EMANUEL

Seffner, FL 33584-3313

Garnishee

BAYADA HOME HEALTH CARE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY , CATHARINE DENISE

Attorney at HIDAY & RICKE P A

4230 S Macdill Ave Ste 214

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

COURT TICKET

03/11/2020: COURT TICKET

FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/25/2020: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/03/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER

06/13/2019: ORDER

MOTION

06/04/2019: MOTION

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

03/04/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ANSWER

02/22/2019: ANSWER

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/14/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/14/2019: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/14/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/14/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/14/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Additional Info: Garnishee: BAYADA HOME HEALTH CARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVDGARN; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED; Comment: BAYADA HOME HEALTH CARE, INC. C/O REGISTERED AGENT, COPRORATION SERVICE COMPANY, 5/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Comment: AS TO EDELENE JULES 4/29/20 MVV PostJudgment@hidayricke.com; Additional Info: Defendant: JULES, EDELENE; Garnishee: BAYADA HOME HEALTH CARE INC; Date Signed: 04/29/2020; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Comment: TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Additional Info: Defendant: JULES, EDELENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: LUBERISSE, LEECHING-HONG EMANUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: JULES, EDELENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FIDELITY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less