This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 12/07/2021 at 13:33:31 (UTC).

FERRUGGIA, STELLA J. vs BATSELL, LAUREN A.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 FERRUGGIA, STELLA J filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BATSELL, LAUREN A. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hinson, C.. Carl, Hinson, Carl. C. and Hinson, Carl C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7786

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hinson, C.. Carl

Hinson, Carl. C.

Hinson, Carl C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

BATSELL, III, JOHN R.

5306 Beamin Dew Loop

Land O/ Lakes, FL 34638

BATSELL, LAUREN A.

Land O' Lakes, FL 34638

BATSELL, JOHN R., III

Land O/ Lakes, FL 34638

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROY , ROB KEVIN

Attorney at KINNEY FERNANDEZ BOIRE

Po Box 18055

Tampa, FL 33679

Defendant Attorney

UNICE , THOMAS ROBERT, Jr

Attorney at UNICE SALZMAN JENSEN, P.A.

1815 Little Rd Fl 2

Trinity, FL 34655

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/27/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/27/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/27/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

09/27/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/28/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/28/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/28/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/27/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/04/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/04/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/11/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003 Judicial Officer: Hinson, Carl C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: BATSELL, JOHN R., III; Defendant: BATSELL, LAUREN A.; Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.; Private Attorney: ROY , ROB KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: BATSELL, JOHN R., III; Defendant: BATSELL, LAUREN A.; Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.; Private Attorney: ROY , ROB KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: BATSELL, JOHN R., III; Defendant: BATSELL, LAUREN A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: BATSELL, JOHN R., III; Defendant: BATSELL, LAUREN A.; Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.; Private Attorney: ROY , ROB KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: BATSELL, JOHN R., III; Defendant: BATSELL, LAUREN A.; Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.; Private Attorney: ROY , ROB KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: BATSELL, JOHN R., III; Defendant: BATSELL, LAUREN A.; Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.; Private Attorney: ROY , ROB KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: BATSELL, JOHN R., III; Defendant: BATSELL, LAUREN A.; Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.; Private Attorney: ROY , ROB KEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: LAUREN A. BATSELL 9/30/2021 INDIVIDUAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JOHN R. BATSELL, III 9/30/2021 SUBSTITITE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FERRUGGIA, STELLA J.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROY , ROB KEVIN