This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/22/2019 at 12:59:43 (UTC).

FENCE OUTLET INC vs PORRECA, SARAH JON

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 FENCE OUTLET INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PORRECA, SARAH JON. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2903

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

FENCE OUTLET INC

1835 E Hallendale Beach Blvd

Hallendale Beach, FL 33009

Defendants, Trustees and Counter Plaintiffs

PORRECA, SARAH

Odessa, FL 33556

DAVID L KOCHE

Tampa, FL 33606

PORRECA, SARAH JON

Odessa, FL 33556

THE 5134 W SAN JOSE TRUST DATED MAY 3, 2017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

CHAVEZ , PAMELA ELIZABETH

Attorney at P.C. LAW FIRM, P.A.

1835 E Hallandale Beach Blvd # 631

Hallandale, FL 33009

Trustee, Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SIMPSON, ALLISON KIRKWOOD

Attorney at THOMAS & LOCICERO

601 S Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33606

SIMPSON , ALLISON KIRKWOOD

Attorney at BARNETT, BOLT, KIRKWOOD, LONG & KOCHE

601 S Bayshore Blvd. Suite 700

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

JOINT STIPULATION

06/24/2019: JOINT STIPULATION

COUNTERCLAIM $2500.01 TO $15000

02/13/2019: COUNTERCLAIM $2500.01 TO $15000

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/08/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/08/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/11/2019: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/11/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/11/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: FENCE OUTLET INC; Plaintiff: FENCE OUTLET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: PORRECA, SARAH JON; Defendant: PORRECA, SARAH JON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: PORRECA, SARAH JON; Defendant: PORRECA, SARAH JON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: PORRECA, SARAH JON; Defendant: PORRECA, SARAH JON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: PLAINTIFF S - TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: FENCE OUTLET INC; Plaintiff: FENCE OUTLET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: PORRECA, SARAH JON; Defendant: PORRECA, SARAH JON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: PORRECA, SARAH JON; Defendant: PORRECA, SARAH JON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: PORRECA, SARAH JON; Defendant: PORRECA, SARAH JON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO DEFENDANT SARAH JON PORRECA S COUNTERCLAIM; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: FENCE OUTLET INC; Plaintiff: FENCE OUTLET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SARAH PORRECA, 2/1/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: DAVID L KOCHE; Defendant Trustee: DAVID L KOCHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Counter-Plaintiff: PORRECA, SARAH JON; Defendant: PORRECA, SARAH JON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: FENCE OUTLET INC; Plaintiff: FENCE OUTLET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: FENCE OUTLET INC; Plaintiff: FENCE OUTLET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: FENCE OUTLET INC; Plaintiff: FENCE OUTLET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: FENCE OUTLET INC; Plaintiff: FENCE OUTLET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: FENCE OUTLET INC; Plaintiff: FENCE OUTLET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019307875; Judge: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FENCE OUTLET INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMPSON , ALLISON KIRKWOOD