This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/28/2023 at 08:04:17 (UTC).

Feliciano, Maria Isabel - Estate

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 Feliciano, Maria Isabel - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4457

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

Simpson, Michael R, Jr

GONZALEZ, NAIDA LEE

SIMPSON, BREANNA MARIE

Claimants

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD

Decedent

Feliciano, Maria Isabel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

PARRI , DANIEL CHARLES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: O/B/O SYNCHRONY BANK - CARECREDIT $2431.48, DAN@PARRILAW.COM 02/24/23; Additional Info: Claimant: ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTES; Comment: CERTIFIED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION SEND TO THE PARRI LAW FIRM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketORD OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Decedent: Feliciano, Maria Isabel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketORD DETERMINING HOMESTEAD; Additional Info: Decedent: Feliciano, Maria Isabel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEND OF FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $515.29, DAN@PARRILAW.COM 01/18/23; Additional Info: Claimant: PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $2981.60, DAN@PARRILAW.COM 01/17/23; Additional Info: Claimant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. PLATINUM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 01/11/23; Additional Info: Claimant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. PLATINUM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: ATTY LTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Simpson, Michael R, Jr; Petitioner: Simpson, Michael R, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Simpson, Michael R, Jr; Petitioner: Simpson, Michael R, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPET FOR SUMMARY ADMIN W-O WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Simpson, Michael R, Jr; Petitioner: Simpson, Michael R, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketPET TO DET HOMESTEAD; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Simpson, Michael R, Jr; Petitioner: Simpson, Michael R, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: BREANNA SIMPSON; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Simpson, Michael R, Jr; Petitioner: Simpson, Michael R, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: NAIDA GONZALEZ; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Simpson, Michael R, Jr; Petitioner: Simpson, Michael R, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Simpson, Michael R, Jr; Petitioner: Simpson, Michael R, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: Simpson, Michael R, Jr; Petitioner: Simpson, Michael R, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less