This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/02/2020 at 23:49:26 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION vs SEAWRIGHT, JACQUELINE L.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SEAWRIGHT, JACQUELINE L. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Rice, G. Elizabeth and Hinson, C.. Carl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1201

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Rice, G. Elizabeth

Hinson, C.. Carl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Po Box 19519

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33318

Defendants

SEAWRIGHT, JACQUELINE L.

Tampa, FL 33603

UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

Tampa, FL 33603

UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2

Tampa, FL 33603

SEAWRIGHT, JUANITA

Tampa, FL 33603

CITY OF TAMPA, FLORIDA

STATE OF FLORIDA

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY FLORIDA CLERK OF CIRCUIT AND COUNTY COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIAZ , ROY ALAN

Attorney at DIAZ ANSELMO LINDBERG, P.A.

499 Nw 70Th Ave Ste 309

Plantation, FL 33317

YARMUTH , LINDSAY BROOKE

Attorney at SERVICE ADDRESS-MAIL@RASFLAW.COM

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

SILVERMAN , ROBIN HORTON

Attorney at CITY OF TAMPA

5Th Floor City Hall 315 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602

RICHARDSON , URSULA DANESE

Attorney at CITY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

315 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 5

Tampa, FL 33602

DANIEL , STEPHANIE ALLISON

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

The Capitol, Suite Pl01 400 S Monroe St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

COHEN , HARRY MICHAEL

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO. CLERK OF THE CIR

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602

WARE , MARK JEROME

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO. CLERK OF THE CIR

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO - FOR

07/25/2019: MOTION TO - FOR

JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

08/29/2019: JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

08/27/2019: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/07/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

ANSWER

03/01/2019: ANSWER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/22/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

08/26/2019: MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

09/10/2019: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

ORDER

08/01/2019: ORDER

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

04/05/2019: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/01/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/01/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL; Comment: AND WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT CITY OF TAMPA'S LEGAL COUNSEL - SIGNED BY RMB; Additional Info: Defendant: CITY OF TAMPA, FLORIDA; Date Signed: 05/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: CITY OF TAMPA, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: CITY OF TAMPA, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL; Comment: FOR DEFT TO ROBIN HORTON SILVERMAN; Additional Info: Defendant: CITY OF TAMPA, FLORIDA; Date Signed: 01/29/2020; Judicial Officer: Hinson, Carl C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDisclaimer of Interest; Additional Info: Defendant: CITY OF TAMPA, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY FLORIDA CLERK OF CIRCUIT AND COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: STATE OF FLORIDA AT ATTORNEY GENERAL R.A. 9/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: CITY OF TAMPA, FLORIDA 9/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: RELATED CASES: 09-CA-30310 AND 14-CA-10314; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less