This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/13/2019 at 17:42:12 (UTC).

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs The Unknown heirs of the Estate of Sandra McCray, deceased

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against The Unknown heirs of the Estate of Sandra McCray, deceased. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rice, G. Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1481

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rice, G. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

P O Box 23028

Tampa, FL 33623

Defendants

The Unknown heirs of the Estate of Sandra McCray, deceased

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Party 3

Tampa, FL 33612

Progressive Express Insurance Company

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

City of Tampa, Florida

Tampa, FL 33602

Unknown Party 1

Tampa, FL 33612

United States of America, Department of Treasury

Tampa, FL 33602

Unknown Party 4

Tampa, FL 33612

State of Florida, Department of Revenue

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Coleman, Sabrina Michelle

Valrico, FL 33594

Jones, Walter J

Winter Haven, FL 33881

Unknown Party 2

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDHARDT , CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

Attorney at ALBERTELLI LAW

5404 Cypress Center Dr Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

MUELLER , ERNEST

Attorney at OFFICE OF CITY ATTORNEY

315 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602-5211

RUDY , JOHN FORNEY, III

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE/USDOJ

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE

03/14/2019: RESPONSE

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

06/13/2019: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/22/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/27/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/27/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/11/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/27/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/18/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

02/12/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

02/11/2019: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • COURT MEMORANDUM; Comment: FROM NJT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE; Comment: TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; Comment: 10/7/19 @ 2PM - AND DIRECTING PRE-TRIAL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: City of Tampa, Florida; Defendant: Coleman, Sabrina Michelle; Defendant: Jones, Walter J; Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company; Defendant: State of Florida, Department of Revenue; Defendant: The Unknown heirs of the Estate of Sandra McCray, deceased; Defendant: United States of America, Department of Treasury; Defendant: Unknown Party 1; Defendant: Unknown Party 2; Defendant: Unknown Party 3; Defendant: Unknown Party 4; Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION; Private Attorney: LINDHARDT , CHRISTOPHER C, Esquire; Private Attorney: MUELLER , ERNEST; Private Attorney: RUDY , JOHN FORNEY, III; Date Signed: 09/02/2019; Judicial Officer: Rice, Elizabeth G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judgment Code: NDUNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY; Judge: Rice, Elizabeth G

    Read MoreRead Less