This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/20/2022 at 23:30:57 (UTC).

FBI WIND DOWN, INC. vs WELL KNOWN HOMEART ENTERPRISES CO., LTD.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 FBI WIND DOWN, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WELL KNOWN HOMEART ENTERPRISES CO , LTD. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, A. Richard and Nielsen, Richard. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1060

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, A. Richard

Nielsen, Richard. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FBI WIND DOWN, INC.

C/O Marcadis Singer, P.A. 5104 Sourth Westshore Blvd.

Tampa, FL 33611

FBI WIND DOWN, INC. LIQUIDATING TRUST

C/O Marcadis Singer, P.A. 5104 South Westshore Blvd.

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant

WELL KNOWN HOMEART ENTERPRISES CO., LTD.

Road No. 6 Tan Dong Hiep Ward Di An Town, Binh Duong

Garnishees

R T G FURNITURE CORP

ORMOND ATLANTIC CORP

ROOMSTOGO.COM INC

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

10/31/2017: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

06/09/2017: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION

06/09/2017: MOTION

MOTION TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

06/09/2017: MOTION TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

05/16/2017: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

05/16/2017: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

05/16/2017: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

04/10/2017: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

02/02/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

02/02/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

REGISTERED MAIL TO

02/02/2017: REGISTERED MAIL TO

ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

02/02/2017: ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

02/02/2017: ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

02/02/2017: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

Fee Worksheet

02/02/2017: Fee Worksheet

Fee Worksheet

02/02/2017: Fee Worksheet

FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE

06/21/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Garnishee: R T G FURNITURE CORP; Plaintiff: FBI WIND DOWN, INC. LIQUIDATING TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJAG; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE; Instrument Number: 2017245009; Judge: Nielsen, Richard A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FBI WIND DOWN, INC. LIQUIDATING TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: FOR DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FBI WIND DOWN, INC.; Plaintiff: FBI WIND DOWN, INC. LIQUIDATING TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FBI WIND DOWN, INC.; Plaintiff: FBI WIND DOWN, INC. LIQUIDATING TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Comment: TO WAGE GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Garnishee: ROOMSTOGO.COM INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Comment: TO WAGE GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Garnishee: ORMOND ATLANTIC CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Comment: TO WAGE GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Garnishee: R T G FURNITURE CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFEE LETTER SENT; Additional Info: Private Attorney: HEMPFLING, JONATHAN P, Esquire

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Additional Info: Defendant: WELL KNOWN HOMEART ENTERPRISES CO., LTD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT; Comment: $260,317.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT; Comment: $260,317.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FBI WIND DOWN, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Worksheet; Comment: Prepared by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Worksheet; Comment: Prepared by Attorney's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less