This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/15/2022 at 15:42:51 (UTC).

Faulk, Lorna vs Walmart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Faulk, Lorna filed an Other lawsuit against Walmart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, Cheryl K, Thomas, K. Cheryl and Thomas, Cheryl. K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5584

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, Cheryl K

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Thomas, Cheryl. K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faulk, Lorna

Seffner, FL 33584

Defendants

Walmart Stores East LP a Foreign Limited Partnersh

1200 S. Pine Island Rd 250

Plantation, FL 33324

Walmart Stores East, LP

1200 S. Pine Island Rd 250

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FULMER , PAUL BRYAN, III

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

201 N Franklin St Fl 7

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/30/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

06/30/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/93553574539 MEETING ID: 935 5357 4539 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDCOURTCALL 888-882-6878 Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Faulk, Lorna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Faulk, Lorna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Faulk, Lorna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Faulk, Lorna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Faulk, Lorna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Faulk, Lorna

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fulmer III, Paul Bryan