This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 01:08:17 (UTC).

FARM BUREAU PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY vs ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 FARM BUREAU PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James, Giardina, James. S, Moody, S. James and Moody, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6927

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARM BUREAU PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

1135 Marbella Plaza Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

838 Walker Road Suite 21-2

Dover, DE 19904

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROULX , JOSEPH CHARLES

Attorney at GOLDEN SCAZ GAGAIN, PLLC

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant Attorney

MANGAN , RICHARD BARRETT, Jr

Attorney at RISSMAN BARRETT HURT DONAHUE & MCLAIN P A

1 N Dale Mabry Hwy Fl 11

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/06/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/07/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/07/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION TO VACATE

01/20/2022: MOTION TO VACATE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/23/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

03/25/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: MAY 18, 2022 @ 10:30AM; Additional Info: Defendant: ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: MAY 18, 2022 @ 10:30AM VIA ZOOM; Additional Info: Defendant: ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO VACATE; Comment: ARBITRATION AWARD; Additional Info: Defendant: ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 1/4/2022 ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FARM BUREAU PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FARM BUREAU PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FARM BUREAU PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FARM BUREAU PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FARM BUREAU PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARM BUREAU PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY 1222 HAMILTON PARKWAY ITASCA IL 60143 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANGAN , RICHARD BARRETT, Jr