Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/17/2021 at 09:46:25 (UTC).

Farfan, Sara vs Riverview OPS LLC

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Farfan, Sara filed an Other lawsuit against Riverview OPS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3270

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farfan, Sara

Atlanta, GA 30349

Defendants

Riverview X LLC

515 East Park Avenue 2Nd Floor

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Riverview OPS LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUM , MICHAEL EDWARD

Attorney at SCHWED, ADAMS, SOBEL & MCGINLEY, P.A.

7111 Fairway Dr Ste 105

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

Defendant Attorney

GILMARTIN , CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT P. KELLY

Po Box 7217

London, KY 40742

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

06/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/16/2021: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/16/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/16/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/16/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/14/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/16/2021: COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RIVERVIEW OPS, LLC, 6/9/21; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Farfan, Sara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Riverview OPS LLC; Defendant: Riverview X LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILMARTIN , CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL