This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/26/2021 at 05:50:45 (UTC).

EZ REPAIR, LLC vs CLEARSHOT COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 EZ REPAIR, LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CLEARSHOT COMMUNICATIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9265

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EZ REPAIR, LLC

18167 Us Hwy 19 N Suite 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

Defendant

CLEARSHOT COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

8415 N Monroe St., Suite 810

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEGAL , LEE

Attorney at SEGAL & SCHUH LAW GROUP, P.L.

18167 U.S. Hwy 19 N. Ste 100

Clearwater, FL 33764

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/26/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/20/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/19/2021: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

ATTACHMENT

11/25/2020: ATTACHMENT

ATTACHMENT

11/25/2020: ATTACHMENT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/25/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: FROM FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF STATE DIVISION OF CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: PLTFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: AFTER DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEARSHOT COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEARSHOT COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE OF CLEARSHOT COMMUNICATIONS , LLC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 12/29/20 DEFT CLEARSHOT COMMUNICATIONS , LLC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: EZ REPAIR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: CLEARSHOT COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE SEGAL ESQ