This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/17/2023 at 06:21:18 (UTC).

EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.,CARBONI, CAROL vs SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P L ,CARBONI, CAROL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, S. Marc and Makholm, Marc. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7544

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, S. Marc

Makholm, Marc. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

CARBONI, CAROL

Defendant

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

ROTHSTEIN , CHRISTINA NOEL

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/27/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/27/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/28/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/27/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/14/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/16/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/17/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023116740; Judge: Makholm, Marc S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less