This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/01/2022 at 03:08:48 (UTC).

EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.,SCHMITT, KENNETH vs HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P L ,SCHMITT, KENNETH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8469

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

Sunrise, FL 33323

SCHMITT, KENNETH

Defendant

HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BANDEZ, EDRIK JOSE

1065 98Th St Apt 7

Bay Harbor Islands, FL 33154-1764

BANDEZ , EDRIK JOSE

Attorney at LANDAU AND ASSOCIATES PA

1065 98Th St Apt 7

Bay Harbor Islands, FL 33154

Defendant Attorney

ZAYNE , CASSANDRA

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1350

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/07/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/07/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/07/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/08/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/08/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

07/06/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/13/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/13/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/15/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/15/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/21/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022363289; Judge: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.; Private Attorney: BANDEZ, EDRIK JOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.; Plaintiff: SCHMITT, KENNETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EXCEL MEDICAL IMAGING, P.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zayne, Cassandra