This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/26/2023 at 05:19:27 (UTC).

Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris vs Optimal US Logistics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Optimal US Logistics, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Polo, M.. Melissa, Polo, Melissa M. and Polo, Melissa. M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0827

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Polo, M.. Melissa

Polo, Melissa M.

Polo, Melissa. M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris

C/O Shirin Vesely, Esq. 200 Central Avenue Suite 1600

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendants

Amazon Logistics Inc.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Amazon.Com, Inc.

300 Deschutes Way Sw Suite 208 Mc-Csc1

Tumwater, WA 98501

DOE, JOHN

Donato, Eugene FRANCIS

Tampa, FL 33629

ESTATE OF BENJAMIN FRANCIS

Francis, Gary WILLIAM

Tampa, FL 33629

Optimal US Logistics, Inc.

4600 140Th Avenue North

Clearwater, FL 33762

MURPHY, KELLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VESELY , SHIRIN MOHAMMADBHOY

Attorney at TRENAM LAW, PA

200 Central Ave Ste 1600

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant Attorneys

COOPER , KATE

Attorney at MINTZER SAROWITZ ZERIS LEDVA & MEYERS

6921 Pistol Range Rd Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33635

CASH , CARY ALAN

Attorney at FREEMAN, GOLDIS & CASH

2553 1St Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33713

UNICE , THOMAS ROBERT, Jr

Attorney at UNICE SALZMAN JENSEN, P.A.

1815 Little Rd Fl 2

Trinity, FL 34655

SEILER , ARIANA LYN

Attorney at VERNIS & BOWLING OF ST. PETERSBURG P.A.

696 1St Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/20/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

03/20/2023: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/20/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PRIVILEGE LOG

03/20/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

03/13/2023: ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

RESPONSE

03/10/2023: RESPONSE

RESPONSE

03/10/2023: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF FILING

03/10/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/30/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/30/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/30/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/30/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003; Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Francis, Gary WILLIAM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Optimal US Logistics, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE; Comment: AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY KELLEY MURPHY; Additional Info: Defendant: Optimal US Logistics, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Francis, Gary WILLIAM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: Francis, Gary WILLIAM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: ESTATE OF BENJAMIN FRANCIS; Defendant: Francis, Gary WILLIAM; Date Signed: 03/13/2023; Judicial Officer:: Polo, Melissa M.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris; Private Attorney: VESELY , SHIRIN MOHAMMADBHOY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris; Private Attorney: VESELY , SHIRIN MOHAMMADBHOY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: DEFENDANTS CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL - ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: ESTATE OF BENJAMIN FRANCIS; Defendant: Francis, Gary WILLIAM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Estate of Taylor Lambe-Koulouris;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less